No. 20-1029
Title:City of Austin, Texas, Petitioner
v.
Reagan National Advertising of Austin, LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50354)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Chambers of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 12 2021Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2021)
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondents Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Incorporated, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Reply of City of Austin not accepted for filing. (May 28, 2021) (Corrected version submitted)
May 26 2021Reply of petitioner City of Austin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition GRANTED.
Aug 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Reagan National Advertising of Austin, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2021Letter requesting case caption correction filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Aug 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including August 13, 2021.
Aug 13 2021Brief of petitioner City of Austin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, November 10, 2021.
Aug 17 2021Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Planning Association in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Amicus brief of Chambers of Commerce, Business Leagues, Environmental Organizations, and On-Premise Sign Associations not accepted for filing. (August 20, 2021)
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University and Professor Genevieve Lakier filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The National League of Cities; The U.S. Conference of Mayors; The International City/County Management Association; The International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of International Sign Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Land Developers, Chambers of Commerce, and Scenic Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Outfront Media Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Florida, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 20 2021Amicus brief of State of Florida, et al., submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 26 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondents brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including September 22, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 01 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED
Sep 22 2021Letter pursuant to Rule 35.3 received.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021Brief of respondents Reagan National Advertising of Austin, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Renea Hicks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Max Renea Hicks
P.O. Box 303187
[Courier: 4112 Ramsey Ave. -- 78756]
Austin, TX 78703

rhicks@renea-hicks.com
(512) 480-8231
Party name: City of Austin
Michael R. DreebenO'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: City of Austin, Texas
Attorneys for Respondents
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Reagan National Advertising of Austin, LLC, et al.
J. Allen Smith
    Counsel of Record
SettlePou
3333 Lee Parkway
Eighth Floor
Dallas, TX 75219

asmith@settlepou.com
2145203300
Party name: Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P., doing business as The Lamar Companies
Bryan Russell HortonGeorge Brothers Kincaid & Horton LLP
114 W. 7th Street, Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

rhorton@gbkh.com
5124951400
Party name: Reagan National Advertising of Austin, LLC
Other
Laura W. Brill
    Counsel of Record
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd.
Suite 1725
Los Angeles, CA 90067

lbrill@kbkfirm.com
310-556-2700
Party name: Outfront Media Inc.
Brian J. Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Otten Johnson Robinson Neff & Ragonetti
950 17th Street, Suite 1600
Denver, CO 80202

bconnolly@ottenjohnson.com
303-575-7589
Party name: The American Planning Association
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Joseph S. Hall
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jhall@kellogghansen.com
2023267983
Party name: International Sign Association
Cooke Wilson Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Parker & Sanchez PLLC
700 Louisiana St, Ste 2700
Houston, TX 77002

cooke@parkersanchez.com
713-659-7200
Party name: Land Developers, Chambers of Commerce, and Scenic Organizations
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law Appellate Advocacy Clinic
Post Office Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
(336) 758-5832
Party name: The National League of Cities; The U.S. Conference of Mayors; The International City/County Management Association; The International Municipal Lawyers Association
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143300
Party name: State of Florida, et al.,
Scott Block Wilkens
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

scott.wilkens@knightcolumbia.org
6467458500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University and Professor Genevieve Lakier
Amanda Kellar Karras
    Counsel of Record
International Municipal Lawyers Association
51 Monroe Street
Suite 404
Rockville, MD 20850

akellar@imla.org
2024665424
Party name: International Municipal Layers Association, et al.
Cooke Wilson Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Parker & Sanchez PLLC
700 Louisiana St, Ste 2700
Houston, TX 77002

cooke@parkersanchez.com
8323416001
Party name: Chambers of Commerce, Business Leagues, Environmental Organizations, and On-Premise Sign Associations