No. 20-1026
Title:Eagle Trust Fund, Petitioner
v.
United States Postal Service, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5090)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States Postal Service to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 23 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Eagle Trust Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 12 2021Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2021)
Mar 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Trust Fund
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Postal Service