No. 20-1019
Title:Jade Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Marietta Education Association, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4217)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2021Waiver of Marietta Education Association, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (February 09, 2021)
Feb 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent Marietta City School District Board of Education to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent Marietta Education Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Feb 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Response Requested. (Due March 31, 2021)
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Fairness Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to April 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2021, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Jade Thompson
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicole Marie Donovsky
    Counsel of Record
Bricker & Eckler LLP
100 S. Third Street
Columbus, OH 43215

ndonovsky@bricker.com
614-227-4866
Party name: Marietta City School District Board of Education
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Marietta Education Association
Other
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JAbernathy@freedomfoundation.com
3609563482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups
Sam Kazman
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

sam.kazman@cei.org
202-331-2265
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Nathan John McGrath
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street
Suite 600B
Harrisburg, PA 17101

njmcgrath@fairnesscenter.org
844.293.1001
Party name: The Fairness Center
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute