No. 20-1018
Title:Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board, Petitioner
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:January 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-30796)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 31, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Motion of The Federation of State Medical Boards for leave to file amicus brief submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Amicus brief of State of Mississippi submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Trade Commission
Other
Jack R. Bierig
    Counsel of Record
Schiff Hardin
233 S. Wacker Drive
Suite 7100
Chicago, IL 60606

jbierig@schiffhardin.com
312-258-5500
Party name: The Federation of State Medical Boards
Krissy Casey Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

krissy.nobile@ago.ms.gov
6013593680
Party name: State of Mississippi