No. 20-1010
Title:Ded Rranxburgaj, Petitioner
v.
Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:January 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2148)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2021 to March 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2021.
Feb 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Church World Service, et al. filed.
AppendixCertificate of Word CountPetitionProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 26 2021Amicus brief of Rapid Defense Network and Justice Action Center submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nora Sam Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Louisiana
P.O. Box 56157
New Orleans, LA 70156

nahmed@laaclu.org
504-522-0628
Party name: Ded Rranxburgaj
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Other
Paul J. Kiernan
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
800 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20006

paul.kiernan@hklaw.com
202-663-7276
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Rapid Defense Network and Justice Action Center
Leon Rodriguez
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
975 F Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

lerodriguez@seyfarth.com
202-463-2400
Party name: Church World Service, et al.