No. 20-101
Title:Lloyd Harris, Petitioner
v.
Maryland
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Special Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(2298, September Term, 2017)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 28, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Maryland to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 03 2020Response Requested. (Due October 5, 2020)
Sep 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Oct 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Maine, Vermont, and Washington Associations of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Lloyd Harris
Attorneys for Respondent
Carrie J. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

cwilliams@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6422
Party name: State of Maryland
Other
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

Stanton.Jones@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5563
Party name: Maine, Vermont, and Washington Associations of Criminal Defense Lawyers