No. 20-1009 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry, Petitioner
v.
David Martinez Ramirez
Docketed:January 27, 2021
Linked with 21A6
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(10-99023)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2021 to March 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2021.
Feb 26 2021Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Indiana, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oregon, South Carolina, and Utah filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 29 2021Brief of respondent David Martinez Ramirez in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 16 2021Reply of petitioners David Shinn, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition GRANTED.
May 25 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2021.
Jun 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Shinn, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, David Martinez Ramirez
Blanket Consent
Jul 14 2021Application (21A6) to file the response and reply briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 15 2021Brief of petitioners David Shinn, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Application (21A6) granted by Justice Kagan to file the response and reply briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits.
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 1, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 13 2021Brief of respondents David Martinez Ramirez & Barry Lee Jones filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The Arizona Justice Project and Robert Bartels filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars Lee Kovarsky, Valena Beety, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Former State Supreme Court Justices and Former Federal Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Network filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Former Department of Justice Officials and Former Federal Prosecutors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Amicus brief of Arizona Capital Representation Project submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Amicus brief of Federal Defender Capital Habeas Units submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Amicus brief of American Bar Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lacey Stover Gard
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
400 West Congress Street
Bldg. S-315
Tucson, AZ 85701

lacey.gard@azag.gov
5206286654
Party name: David Shinn, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: David Martinez Ramirez & Barry Lee Jones
Timothy M. GabrielsenFederal Public Defender's Office
407 W. Congress, Ste. 501
Tucson, AZ 85701

tim_gabrielsen@fd.org
520-879-7614
Party name: David Martinez Ramirez
Other
Boris Bershteyn
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602

boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
212-735-3000
Party name: Habeas Scholars
Jeffrey Ryan Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jeffreyjohnson@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Former State Supreme Court Justices and Former Federal Judges
Aaron Michael Katz
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02199

aaron.katz@ropesgray.com
617-951-7117
Party name: Bipartisan Former Department of Justice Officials and Former Federal Prosecutors
Paul Alessio Mezzina
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

pmezzina@kslaw.com
(202) 737-0500
Party name: Federal Defender Capital Habeas Units
Joel W. Nomkin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

jnomkin@perkinscoie.com
602.351.8185
Party name: Robert Bartels and The Arizona Justice Project
Natman Schaye
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Capital Representation Project
101 East Pennington St
Suite 201
Tucson, AZ 85701

natman@azcapitalproject.org
5209070457
Party name: Arizona Capital Representation Project
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Clark Hill, PLC
500 Woodward Ave
Suite 3500
Detroit, MI 48226

rturner@clarkhill.com
3139658318
Party name: American Bar Association
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Habeas Scholars Lee Kovarsky, Valena Beety, et al.
Collin Partington Wedel
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

cwedel@sidley.com
(213) 896-6649
Party name: The Innocence Network
Elizabeth Ashley Kiernan
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

ekiernan@gibsondunn.com
214.698.3100
Party name: Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.