No. 20-1006
Title:City of Hayward, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jessie Lee Jetmore Stoddard-Nunez
Docketed:January 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16403)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Jesse Lee Jetmore Stoddard-Nunez to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Feb 24 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by International Municipal Lawyers Association. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Peace Officers' Research Association of California, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2021Proposal under Rule 32.3 to lodge non-record material with the Clerk filed by counsel for amici curiae Peace Officers' Research Association of California, PORAC Legal Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Response Requested. (Due April 7, 2021)
Mar 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2021 to June 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2021.
Jun 07 2021Brief of respondent Jessie Lee Jetmore Stoddard-Nunez in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Reply of petitioners City of Hayward, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Louis Fox
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
Spear Tower, One Market Plaza, Suite 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105

mlfox@duanemorris.com
415.957.3092
Party name: City of Hayward, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Aaron Avery
    Counsel of Record
Michael Avery
1219 Rockrose Rd. N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87122

mavery@suffolk.edu
6173355023
Party name: Jessie Lee Jetmore Stoddard-Nunez
Other
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association
Michael Logan Rains
    Counsel of Record
Rains Lucia Stern St. Phalle & Silver, PC
2300 Contra Costa Blvd.
Suite 500
Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

mrains@rlslawyers.com
925-609-1699
Party name: Peach Officers' Research Association of California, PORAC Legal Defense Fund, et al.