No. 20-1000
Title:Monico Dominguez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-10268)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2021 to March 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2021 to April 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 30, 2021.
Apr 30 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2021Reply of petitioner Monico Dominguez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
May 28 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Monico Dominguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States