No. 20-10
Title:Emily Kollaritsch, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michigan State University Board of Trustees, et al.
Docketed:July 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2445, 18-1715)
   Decision Date:December 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2020 to September 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 9, 2020.
Jul 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Emily Kollaritsch, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Justice, P.C., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Center for Victims of Crime filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
580 Massie Road
UVA Law School
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dortiz@law.virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Emily Kollaritsch, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael E. Baughman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders
3000 Two Logan Square
18th and Arch Streets
Philadelphia, PA 19103

michael.baughman@troutman.com
215-981-4964
Party name: Michigan State University Board of Trustees
Other
Seanna Rose Brown
    Counsel of Record
Baker Hostetler LLP
45 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10111

sbrown@bakerlaw.com
212-589-4200
Party name: Public Justice, The California Women’s Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Know Your Ix, And The Women’s Law Project