No. 19A960
Title:Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al., Applicants
v.
Innovation Law Lab, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15716)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2020Application (19A960) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Response to application (19A960) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, March 9, by 4 p.m. ET.
Mar 09 2020Response to application from respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Reply of applicants Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) referred to the Court.
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted, and the district court’s April 8, 2019 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Chad F. Wolf, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judy Rabinovitz
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
Immmigrants' Rights Project
132 West 43rd Street
New York, NY 10036-0000

JRabinovitz@aclu.org
(212) 549-2618
Party name: Innovation Law Lab, et al.
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute