No. 19A785
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Applicants
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:January 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3591; 19-3595)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2020Application (19A785) for a stay, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 14 2020Response to application (19A785) requested by Justice Ginsburg, due Wednesday, January 22, by 3 p.m. ET.
Jan 22 2020Response to application from respondents New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Response to application from respondents Make the Road New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The American Academy of Pediatrics, et al.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jan 22 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by U.S. House of Representatives.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Jan 23 2020Reply of applicants Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Jan 27 2020Application (19A785) referred to the Court.
Jan 27 2020Application (19A785) granted by the Court. JUSTICE GINSBURG, JUSTICE BREYER, JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, and JUSTICE KAGAN would deny the application. JUSTICE GORSUCH, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS joins,concurring in the grant of stay.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew James Ehrlich
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton and Garrison, LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

aehrlich@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Make the Road, African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, Connecticut, Vermont, City of New York
Other
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives
Maureen Patricia Alger
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

malger@cooley.com
6508435201
Party name: American Medical Association, The American College of Physicians, The American Academy of Pediatrics and The American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute