No. 19A60
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Applicants
v.
Sierra Club, et al.
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16102, 19-16300)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2019Application (19A60) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Response to application (19A60) requested by Justice Kagan, due Friday, July 19, 2019, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jul 19 2019Response to application from respondents Sierra Club, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by California, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by U.S. House of Representatives.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Tohono O'odham Nation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 19 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Rep. Andy Barr.
Main Document
Jul 22 2019Reply of applicant Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Application (19A60) referred to the Court.
Jul 26 2019Application (19A60) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. Among the reasons is that the Government has made a sufficient showing at this stage that the plaintiffs have no cause of action to obtain review of the Acting Secretary’s compliance with Section 8005. The District Court’s June 28, 2019 order granting a permanent injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. JUSTICE GINSBURG, JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, and JUSTICE KAGAN would deny the application. JUSTICE BREYER, concurring in part and dissenting inpart from grant of stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Cecillia Derphine Wang
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

cwang@aclu.org
415-343-0775
Party name: Sierra Club, et al.
Other
James Fred Zahradka II
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1515 Clay Street, Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612

james.zahradka@doj.ca.gov
510-879-1247
Party name: State of California
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: U.S. Rep. Andy Barr
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, United States House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Samuel Franklin Daughety
    Counsel of Record
Dentons-US LLP
1900 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

samuel.daughety@dentons.com
202-408-6427
Party name: Tohono O'odham Nation