No. 19A886 | |
Title: | Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH, Applicant v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. |
Docketed: | February 7, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1368 2019-1369) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2020 | Application (19A886) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 10 2020 | UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, case Nos. 2019-1368 and 2019-1369, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Thursday, February 13, 2020, by 4:30 p.m. ET, and further order of the undersigned or of the Court. |
Feb 13 2020 | Response to application from respondent Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 14 2020 | The order heretofore issued by The Chief Justice on February 10, 2020, is vacated. The application for a stay is, in all respects, denied. |
Feb 14 2020 | Reply of applicant Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH filed. |
Reply |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam Baker Banks Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 adam.banks@weil.com | 212 310-8000 |
Party name: Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Douglas H Carsten Counsel of Record | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati 12235 El Camino Real San Diego, CA 92130 dcarsten@wsgr.com | 8583502305 |
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. |