No. 19A545
Title:Donald J. Trump, et al., Applicants
v.
Mazars USA, LLP, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5142)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2019Application (19A545) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Letter of respondent Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives received.
Main Document
Nov 18 2019UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants and the November 18, 2019 letter received from counsel for respondent the Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5142, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Thursday, November 21, 2019, by 3 p.m. ET, and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Nov 21 2019Response to application from respondent Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Reply of applicant Donald Trump, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Application (19A545) referred to the Court.
Nov 25 2019Application (19A545) granted by the Court. The application for stay of the mandate presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted. The issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5142, is stayed pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, if such petition is filed on or before December 5, 2019, by noon. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. If no petition for a writ of certiorari is filed on or before December 5, 2019, by noon, the stay shall terminate.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Donald Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, United States House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives