No. 19A429 | |
Title: | Bank of America Corporation, et al., Applicants v. City of Miami, Florida |
Docketed: | October 18, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-14543 14-14544) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 17 2019 | Application (19A429) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Oct 21 2019 | Response to application (19A429) requested by Justice Thomas, due Monday, October 28, 2019, by 4 p.m. ET. |
Oct 28 2019 | Response to application from respondent City of Miami filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 30 2019 | Reply of applicant Bank of America Corp., et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Oct 30 2019 | Application (19A429) referred to the Court. |
Oct 30 2019 | Application (19A429) denied by the Court. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
William McGinley Jay Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter, LLP 901 New York Ave., NW Washington, DC 20001 WJay@goodwinlaw.com | 2023464190 |
Party name: Bank of America Corp., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Robert S. Peck Counsel of Record | Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C. 455 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Suite 152 Washington, DC 20001 robert.peck@cclfirm.com | 2029442874 |
Party name: City of Miami |