No. 19A368 | |
Title: | BP P.L.C., et al., Applicants v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore |
Docketed: | October 2, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-1644) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 01 2019 | Application (19A368) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Oct 02 2019 | Letter of applicants BP P.L.C., et al. received. |
Main DocumentOther | |
Oct 04 2019 | Response to application (19A368) requested by The Chief Justice, due Friday, October 18, 2019, by 3 p.m. ET. |
Oct 04 2019 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Manufacturers. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Oct 10 2019 | Letter of applicant BP P.L.C., et al. received. |
Main Document | |
Oct 18 2019 | Response to application from respondent Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 22 2019 | Application (19A368) referred to the Court. |
Oct 22 2019 | Application (19A368) denied by the Court. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this application. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 333 South Grand Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90071 tboutrous@gibsondunn.com | (213) 229-7804 |
Party name: BP P.L.C., et al. | ||
Shawn Patrick Regan Counsel of Record | Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP 200 Park Avenue 52nd Floor New York, NY 10166 sregan@hunton.com | 212-309-1000 |
Party name: Marathon Petroleum Corporation and Speedway LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Victor M. Sher Counsel of Record | Sher Edling LLP 100 Montgomery Street Suite 1410 San Francisco, CA 94104 vic@sheredling.com | 628-231-2500 |
Party name: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore | ||
Other | ||
Philip S. Goldberg Counsel of Record | Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP 1800 K Street, N.W. Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20006 pgoldberg@shb.com | 202-662-4860 |
Party name: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS |