No. 19A1055
Title:Texas Democratic Party, et al., Applicants
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2020
Linked with 19-1389
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50407)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2020Application (19A1055) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Response to application (19A1055) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, June 22, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jun 22 2020Response to application from respondents Greg Abbott, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2020Reply of applicants Texas Democratic Party, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 26 2020Application (19A1055) referred to the Court.
Jun 26 2020Application (19A1055) denied by the Court. Statement of JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR respecting the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Brazil & Dunn
4407 Bee Caves Road
Building 1, Suite 111
Austin, TX 78746

chad@brazilanddunn.com
512-717-9822
Party name: Brenda Li Garcia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Greg Abbott, et al.