No. 19A1047
Title:Mark Williams, Warden, et al., Applicants
v.
Craig Wilson, et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3347 20-3547)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2020Application (19A1047) for a stay, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 01 2020Response to application (19A1047) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Wednesday, June 3, by noon ET.
Jun 03 2020Letter of applicants Mark Williams, Warden, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Response to application from respondents Craig Wilson, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 04 2020Reply of applicants Mark Williams, Warden, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 04 2020UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants, the response filed thereto, and the reply, IT IS ORDERED that the District Court’s April 22 and May 19 orders are hereby stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit and further order of Justice Sotomayor or of the Court.
Oct 26 2020Letter of applicant received.
Oct 26 2020Application (19A1047) withdrawn.
Oct 26 2020Withdraw the Stay Application of Mark Williams, Warden, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

oldSupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mark Williams, Warden, et al.
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mark Williams, Warden, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: Craig Wilson, et al.