No. 19A1034 | |
Title: | Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al., Applicants v. Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, et al. |
Docketed: | May 4, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-20207) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 04 2020 | Application (19A1034) to vacate stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main Document | |
May 04 2020 | Response to application (19A1034) requested by Justice Alito, due Friday, May 8, by 5 p.m. ET |
May 08 2020 | Response to application from respondents Bryan Collier, et al. filed. |
Main Document | |
May 09 2020 | Reply of applicants Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. filed. |
Reply | |
May 12 2020 | Supplemental brief of applicants Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. filed. |
Main Document | |
May 12 2020 | Response to supplemental brief filed by respondents Bryan Collier, et al. |
Main Document | |
May 14 2020 | Application (19A1034) referred to the Court. |
May 14 2020 | Application (19A1034) denied by the Court. Statement of JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE GINSBURG joins, respecting the denial of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion). |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Brandon W. Duke Counsel of Record | Winston & Strawn LLP 800 Capitol Street Suite 2400 Houston, TX 77002-5242 bduke@winston.com | 7136512636 |
Party name: Laddy Curtis Valentine, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kyle Douglas Hawkins Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov | 5129361700 |
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al. |