No. 19A1032 | |
Title: | Friends of Danny DeVito, et al., Applicants v. Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al. |
Docketed: | April 27, 2020 |
Linked with 19-1265 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District |
Case Numbers: | (68 MM 2020) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 27 2020 | Application (19A1032) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Apr 28 2020 | Response to application (19A1032) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, May 4, by noon. |
May 04 2020 | Response to application from respondents Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 04 2020 | Amended Application to Stay the Enforcement of Gov. Wolf's Executive Order Dated March 19, 2020 Pending the Filing and Disposition by the US Supreme Court of Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. not accepted for filing. (May 04, 2020) |
May 04 2020 | Supplemental brief of applicants Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 06 2020 | Reply of applicants Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 06 2020 | Application (19A1032) referred to the Court. |
May 06 2020 | Application (19A1032) denied by the Court. |
Jun 05 2020 | Supplemental Brief in Support of Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. not accepted for filing. (June 05, 2020) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Marc A. Scaringi Counsel of Record | Scaringi & Scaringi, PC 2000 Linglestown Road Suite 106 Harrisburg, PA 17110 marc@scaringilaw.com | 7176577770 |
Party name: Friends of Danny DeVito, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
John Bartley DeLone Counsel of Record | Attorney General's Office Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section 15th Floor, Strawberry Square Harrisburg, PA 17120 jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov | 717-712-3818 |
Party name: Tom Wolf, Governor, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Jonathan Shae Goldstein Counsel of Record | Goldstein Law Partners, LLC 11 Church Road Hatfield, PA 19440 jgoldstein@goldsteinlp.com | 215-266-5948 |
Party name: Schulmerich Bells, LLC |