No. 19-995
Title:Michael J. Murray, Petitioner
v.
Mayo Clinic, et al.
Docketed:February 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16803)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountAppendix
Mar 10 2020Brief of respondents Mayo Clinic, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 25, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 8, 2020, granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roger Lowell Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Jaburg & Wilk, P.C.
3200 N. Central Ave.
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

rlc@jaburgwilk.com
6022481000
Party name: Michael Murray
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Martin Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer LLP
One South Church Avenue
400 East Van Buren Street, Ste.
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

ajacobs@swlaw.com
602-382-6308
Party name: Mayo Clinic, et al.