No. 19-992
Title:Greg Skipper, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Curtis Jerome Byrd
Docketed:February 7, 2020
Linked with 19A689
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2021)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Application (19A689) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 18 2019Application (19A689) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 5, 2020.
Feb 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Curtis Jerome Byrd.
Blanket Consent
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, Alaska, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Maine, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Greg Skipper, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth L. Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
615 Griswold. Suite 1125
Detroit, MI 48226

elzjacobs@aol.com
2488919844
Party name: Curtis Jerome Byrd
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alaska, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Maine, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia