No. 19-988
Title:Living Essentials, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Washington
Docketed:February 6, 2020
Linked with 19A646
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(76463-2-1)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 3, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2019Application (19A646) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2020 to February 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 10 2019Application (19A646) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 3, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Feb 27 2020Response Requested. (Due March 30, 2020)
Feb 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Robert M McKenna and Michael C Turpen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to May 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2020.
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute; Reason Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020.
Jun 29 2020Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Reply of petitioners Living Essentials, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Living Essentials, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Peter Benjamin Gonick
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Washington
PO Box 40100
1125 Washington Street SE
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

peterg@atg.wa.gov
3607536245
Party name: State of Washington
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute; Reason Foundation
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, et al.
Robert Allen Nance
    Counsel of Record
Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison & Lewis
528 N.W. 12th Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73103

rnance@riggsabney.com
(405) 843-9909
Party name: Robert M McKenna and Michael C Turpen
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center