No. 19-978
Title:Team Resources Incorporated, et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:February 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10931)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2020Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Liu v. SEC, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Phillip J. DeRosier
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
500 Woodward Ave
Suite 4000
Detroit, MI 48226

pderosier@dickinsonwright.com
3132233500
Party name: Team Resources Incorporated, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission