No. 19-975
Title:Center for Biological Diversity, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:February 4, 2020
Linked with 19A463
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Columbia
   Case Numbers:(18-cv-0655-KBJ, 19-cv-2085-KBJ)
   Decision Date:September 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Application (19A463) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 3, 2019 to February 1, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Application (19A463) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 1, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Center for Biological Diversity, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Mar 05 2020Waiver of right of respondents Chad F. Wolf, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of La Union del Pueblo Entero (LUPE) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Local Governments filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Dr. Deni J. Seymour, Rick and Sandy Martynec, Gayle Hartmann, Dr. Paul R. and Dr. Suzanne Fish, and Archaeology Southwest filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of North American Butterfly Association and National Butterfly Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 17 2020Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2020)
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020.
May 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to May 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2020.
May 21 2020Brief of respondents Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anchun Jean Su
    Counsel of Record
Center for Biological Diversity
1411 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

jsu@biologicaldiversity.org
2028498399
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Chad F. Wolf, et al.
Other
William Stewart Eubanks II
    Counsel of Record
Eubanks & Associates, LLC
2601 S. Lemay Avenue
Unit 7-240
Fort Collins, CO 80525

bill@eubankslegal.com
9707036060
Party name: Dr. Deni J. Seymour, Rick and Sandy Martynec, Gayle Hartmann, Dr. Paul R. and Dr. Suzanne Fish, and Archaeology Southwest
Katherine Anne Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Animal Law & Policy Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

kmeyer@law.harvard.edu
2022575145
Party name: North American Butterfly Association and National Butterfly Center
Efren Carlos Olivares
    Counsel of Record
Texas Civil Rights Project
1701 W. Hackberry Ave.
Alamo, TX 78516

efren@texascivilrightsproject.org
9567878171
Party name: La Union del Pueblo Entero (LUPE)
Deborah A. Sivas
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Enviromental Law Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

dsivas@stanford.edu
650-724-1900
Party name: Local Governments