No. 19-974
Title:William T. Schmitt, et al., Petitioners
v.
Frank LaRose, Ohio Secretary of State
Docketed:February 4, 2020
Linked with 19A518
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3196)
   Decision Date:August 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Application (19A518) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 3, 2019 to February 1, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 13 2019Application (19A518) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 3, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2020 to April 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 6, 2020.
Mar 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 6, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Initiative and Referendum Institute and Center for Competitive Democracy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Direct Democracy Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark R. Brown
    Counsel of Record
303 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215-3200

mbrown@law.capital.edu
614-236-6590
Party name: William Schmitt, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Frank LaRose
Other
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
202-879-7622
Party name: Initiative and Referendum Institute and Center for Competitive Democracy
Stephanie Schuster
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

stephanie.schuster@morganlewis.com
2023736595
Party name: Direct Democracy Scholars