No. 19-972
Title:Christopher Edward McMillen, Petitioner
v.
New Caney Independent School District
Docketed:February 3, 2020
Linked with 19A599
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-20420)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2019Application (19A599) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to January 30, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Application (19A599) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 30, 2020.
Jan 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent New Caney Independent School District to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 19 2020Response Requested. (Due March 20, 2020)
Mar 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Christopher Edward McMillen
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles Cory Rush
    Counsel of Record
Karczewski | Bradshaw | Spalding
3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 560
Houston, TX 77098

crush@kbslawgroup.com
(713) 993-7066
Party name: New Caney Independent School District