No. 19-968
Title:Chike Uzuegbunam, et al., Petitioners
v.
Stanley C. Preczewski, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2020
Linked with 19A461
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12676)
   Decision Date:July 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2019Application (19A461) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 3, 2019 to January 31, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Application (19A461) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 31, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020.
Feb 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Young Americans for Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Humanist Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Brief of respondents Stanley Preczewski, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 05 2020Reply of petitioners Chike Uzuegbunam, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jul 27 2020Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2020Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 8, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2020.
Aug 25 2020Joint motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Sep 01 2020Joint motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 22, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including November 19, 2020.
Sep 22 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Brief of petitioners Chike Uzuegbunam, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Amicus brief of Council on American-Islamic Relations submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-651-9453
Party name: Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Other
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
CAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

lmasri@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law Appellate Clinic
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Young Americans for Liberty, Inc.
Kevin Franz King
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

kking@cov.com
2026625488
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
2022389088
Party name: American Humanist Association