No. 19-963
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:January 31, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 21 2020Reply of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jun 25 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Henry Schein, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 13, 2020.
Aug 21 2020Motion to file the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioner Henry Schein, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Joint appendix (Redacted copies for the Public) filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief of petitioner Henry Schein, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 26 2020Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Benco Dental Supply Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Lewis T. LeClairMcKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Other
David M. Axelrad
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz and Levy LLP
3601 West Olive Avenue
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Kenneth L Racowski
    Counsel of Record
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
Two Liberty Place
50 S 16th Street, Suite 3200
Philadelphia, PA 19102

kenneth.racowski@bipc.com
215-665-8700
Party name: Benco Dental Supply Company