No. 19-959
Title:TAMKO Building Products, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Daniel Williams, et al.
Docketed:January 31, 2020
Linked with 19A631
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(117,190)
   Decision Date:October 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2019Application (19A631) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 30, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 06 2019Application (19A631) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 29, 2020.
Jan 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2020 to April 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2020.
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for the Rule of Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: TAMKO Building Products, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
2028615241
Party name: Daniel Williams, et al.
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Center for the Rule of Law