No. 19-956
Title:Donald E. Craig, et al., Petitioners
v.
Janet Turner O'Kelley, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Harley Turner, et al.
Docketed:January 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14512)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Mar 02 2020Brief of respondents Janet O'Kelley, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2020Reply of petitioners Sheriff Donald Craig, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Russell Alan Britt
    Counsel of Record
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
191 Peachtree Street, Suite 2900
Atlanta, GA 30303

rbritt@hallboothsmith.com
404-954-5000
Party name: Sheriff Donald Craig, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sidney Leighton Moore III
    Counsel of Record
The Moore Firm, P.C.
1026 Kasper Road
Moscow, ID 83343

leighton@moorefirmpc.com
4042855724
Party name: Janet O'Kelley, et al.
Other
Christopher D. Balch
    Counsel of Record
Balch Law Group
830 Glenwood Ave., SE
Suite 510-220
Atlanta, GA 30316

chris@balchlawgroup.com
404-963-0045
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association