No. 19-953
Title:Charles Farrar, Petitioner
v.
Dean Williams, Executive Director, Colorado Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:January 30, 2020
Linked with 19A587
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1005)
   Decision Date:May 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2019Application (19A587) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 26, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Application (19A587) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 27, 2020.
Jan 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Waiver of right of respondent Dean Williams, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 04 2020Response Requested. (Due June 3, 2020)
Jun 03 2020Brief of respondents Dean Williams, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 17 2020Reply of petitioner Charles Farrar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Charles Farrar
Attorneys for Respondents
L. Andrew Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Dean Williams, et al.