No. 19-949
Title:Wisconsin Department of Revenue, et al., Petitioners
v.
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Docketed:January 29, 2020
Linked with 19A693
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1741)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Application (19A693) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 5, 2020 to January 27, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 20 2019Application (19A693) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 27, 2020.
Jan 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2020.
Mar 26 2020Brief of Union Pacific Railroad Company in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Patrick Keenan
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W Main Street, P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707

keenanbp@doj.state.wi.us
6082660020
Party name: Wisconsin Department of Revenue, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Dorr Goodwin
    Counsel of Record
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz
165 Madison Avenue
Suite 2000
Memphis, TN 38103

sgoodwin@bakerdonelson.com
901.577.2141
Party name: Union Pacific Railroad Company