No. 19-941 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Billy Daniel Raulerson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Warden
Docketed:January 28, 2020
Linked with 19A512
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-14038)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Application (19A512) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2019 to January 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 14 2019Application (19A512) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 24, 2020.
Jan 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David W. DeBruin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

DDeBruin@jenner.com
202-639-6015
Party name: Billy Daniel Raulerson, Jr.