No. 19-939
Title:Stephen Gustus, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 28, 2020
Linked with 19A588
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2303)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2019Application (19A588) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 8, 2019 to February 6, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Application (19A588) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 7, 2020.
Dec 20 2019Application (19A588) to extend further the time from January 7, 2020 to January 27, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Application (19A588) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 27, 2020.
Jan 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2020.
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Stephen Gustus
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States