No. 19-935
Title:Carl Leeper, Petitioner
v.
Hamilton County Coal, LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1109)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Paul Green
    Counsel of Record
Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.
2227 South State Route 157
Edwardsville, IL 62025

kevin@ghalaw.com
618-656-5150
Party name: Carl Leeper