No. 19-933
Title:Monex Deposit Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Docketed:January 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55815)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent Commodity Futures Trading Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2020Response Requested. (Due March 30, 2020)
Mar 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to May 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Monex Deposit Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Other
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
Litigation Counsel
1225 19th Street NW Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

adi.dynar@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
(202) 869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Ronald Walter Opsahl
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

ropsahl@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation