No. 19-930
Title:CIC Services, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Internal Revenue Service, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2020
Linked with 19A440
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5019)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Application (19A440) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Application (19A440) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 3, 2020.
Dec 13 2019Application (19A440) to extend further the time from January 3, 2020 to January 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Application (19A440) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 17, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
617-227-0548
Party name: CIC Services, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Internal Revenue Service
Other
David William Foster
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

david.foster@skadden.com
202-371-7626
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel