No. 19-927 | |
Title: | Wayne M. Klocke, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Klocke, Petitioner v. The University of Texas at Arlington |
Docketed: | January 24, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-10857) |
Decision Date: | September 10, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 21, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 21 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 04 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent The Universtiy of Texas At Arlington to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020. |
Mar 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jonathan T. Suder Counsel of Record | Friedman, Suder & Cooke, P.C. 604 E. 4th Street Suite 200 Fort Worth, TX 76102 jts@fsclaw.com | 8173340400 |
Party name: Wayne Klocke | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kyle Douglas Hawkins Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov | 5129361700 |
Party name: The Universtiy of Texas At Arlington |