No. 19-924
Title:Indiana, Petitioner
v.
Ernesto Ruiz
Docketed:January 23, 2020
Linked with 19A531
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(19S-CR-336)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Application (19A531) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 21, 2019 to January 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 15 2019Application (19A531) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 20, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ernesto Ruiz to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 17 2020Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2020)
Mar 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Ernesto Ruiz
Mark E. KamishBaldwin Perry & Kamish, P.C.
23 South 8th Street, Suite 300
Noblesville, IN 46060

mark@criminaldefenseteam.com
317-736-0053
Party name: Ernesto Ruiz