No. 19-917
Title:Joslyn Manufacturing Company, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation, et al.
Docketed:January 22, 2020
Linked with 19A600
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2633, 18-2738)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2019Application (19A600) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2019 to January 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Application (19A600) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 20, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2020 to April 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 6, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Joslyn Manufacturing Co., LLC and Joslyn Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
David L. Hatchett
    Counsel of Record
Hatchett & Hauck LLP
150 W. Market Street, Suite 200
Indianapolis, IN 46204

david.hatchett@h2lawyers.com
3174642621
Party name: Valbruna Slater Steel Corp. and Fort Wayne Steel Corp.