No. 19-914
Title:Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:January 22, 2020
Linked with 19A528
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2847, 18-3310)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2019Application (19A528) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 19, 2019 to January 18, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 18 2019Application (19A528) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 18, 2020.
Jan 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.
Mar 23 2020Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 01 2020Reply of petitioners Credit Bureau Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, et al.
Stephen R. CochellThe Cochell Law Firm, P.C.
5850 San Felipe
Houston, TX 77057

srcochell@gmail.com
3468003500
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alden Francis Abbott
    Counsel of Record
Federal Trade Commission
600 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20580

aabbott@ftc.gov
202-326-2505
Party name: Federal Trade Commission