No. 19-910
Title:K. G. S., Individually and as Guardian and Next Friend of Baby Doe, a Minor Child, Petitioner
v.
Facebook, Inc.
Docketed:January 22, 2020
Linked with 19A483
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(1170244)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2019Application (19A483) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 21, 2019 to January 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Nov 05 2019Application (19A483) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 17, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: K.G.S., Individually and As Guardian and Next Friend of Baby Doe
Attorneys for Respondent
Mitchell Pearsall Reich
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20004

mitchell.reich@hoganlovells.com
2026375833
Party name: Facebook, Inc.