No. 19-896
Title:Matthew T. Albence, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al., Petitioners
v.
Antonio Arteaga-Martinez
Docketed:January 21, 2020
Linked with 19A515
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1054)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Application (19A515) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 18, 2019 to December 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Nov 12 2019Application (19A515) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 18, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Application (19A515) to extend further the time from December 18, 2019 to January 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Dec 10 2019Application (19A515) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 17, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2020)
Jan 17 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and shouild not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Feb 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Brief of respondent Antonio Arteaga-Martinez in opposition filed.
May 08 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 12, 2020 to May 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
May 08 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 19, 2020, granted.
May 14 2020Reply of petitioners Matthew T. Albence, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration, et al. filed. (Distributed)
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Albence, Dir. of U.S. Immigration, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Pratik A. Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Antonio Arteaga-Martinez