No. 19-893
Title:Shimon Waronker, Petitioner
v.
Hempstead Union Free School District, et al.
Docketed:January 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-407)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 19, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Shimon Waronker
Attorneys for Respondents
Austin Reis Graff
    Counsel of Record
The Scher Law Firm, LLP
One Old Country Road, Suite 385
Carie Piace, NY 11514

agraff@scherlawfirm.com
5167465040
Party name: Hempstead Unified School District, et al.