No. 19-889
Vide 19-1042
Title:Kaufman County, Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Eunice J. Winzer, Individually and on Behalf of the Statutory Beneficiaries of Gabriel A. Winzer, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11482)
   Decision Date:February 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2020Waiver of right of respondent Eunice J. Winzer to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Texas Association of Counties, Texas Municipal League, Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool, Mississippi Municipal Service Company, and National Association of Police Organization filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Mar 31 2020Response Requested. (Due April 30, 2020)
Apr 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2020 to May 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 5, 2020.
May 05 2020Brief of respondent Eunice J. Winzer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Cass Weiland
    Counsel of Record
Patton Boggs LLP
2000 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75201

cass.weiland@squirepb.com
214 758 1504
Party name: Kaufman County; Matthew Hinds
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Joseph Kita
    Counsel of Record
Quilling Selander Cummiskey and Lownds.PC
2001 Bryan Street
Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201

matt@mattkita.com
214-699-1863
Party name: Eunice J. Winzer
Other
Gregory Todd Butler
    Counsel of Record
Phelps Dunbar LLP
P.O. Box 16114
Jackson, MS 39236

Todd.Butler@phelps.com
601-352-2300
Party name: Texas Association of Counties, Texas Municipal League, Texas Municipal League Intergovernmental Risk Pool, Mississippi Municipal Service Company, and National Association of Police Organization