No. 19-8850 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Billy Joe Wardlow, Petitioner v. Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
Docketed: | July 7, 2020 |
Linked with 19A1069 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-70012) |
Decision Date: | July 6, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 07 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 6, 2020) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | |
Jul 07 2020 | Application (19A1069) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 08 2020 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 08 2020 | Application (19A1069) referred to the Court. |
Jul 08 2020 | Application (19A1069) denied by the Court. |
Jul 08 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
Jul 08 2020 | Reply of petitioner Billy Joe Wardlow filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Richard H. Burr III Counsel of Record | Burr and Welch, PC PO Box 525 Leggett, TX 77350 dick.burrandwelch@gmail.com | 713-628-3391 |
Party name: Billy Joe Wardlow | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Gwendolyn Suzanne Vindell Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office 300 W. 15th St. Austin, TX 78701 gwendolyn.vindell2@oag.texas.gov | 5124753448 |
Party name: Lorie Davis |