No. 19-878
Title:Guy Gentile, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:January 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1242)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2020 to March 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Caleb Ford
    Counsel of Record
Ford O'Brien LLP
575 Fifth Ave Fl. 17
New York, NY 10017

aford@fordobrien.com
2128580040
Party name: Guy Gentile
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission