No. 19-875
Title:OTO, L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
Ken Kho, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2020
Linked with 19A487
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S244630)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2019Application (19A487) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 13, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 04 2019Application (19A487) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 13, 2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, OTO, L.L.C.
Blanket Consent
Jan 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ken Kho to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Ken Kho.
Blanket Consent
Feb 13 2020Brief amici curiae of California New Car Dealers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of Civil Justice Association of California filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Feb 27 2020Response Requested. (Due March 30, 2020)
Mar 11 2020Motion of respondent Julia A. Su, California Labor Commissioner to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020Motion of respondent Ken Kho to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2020The motions to extend the time to file responses to the petition are granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: OTO, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondents
Miles E. Locker
    Counsel of Record
Division of Labor Standards Enforcement - Legal Section
455 Golden Gate Ave., 9th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94102

mlocker@dir.ca.gov
415-703-4863
Party name: Julie A. Su, California Labor Commissioner
David A. Rosenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld
1001 Marina Village Parkway
Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501

drosenfeld@unioncounsel.net
5103371001
Party name: Ken Kho
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Bradley Joseph Hamburger
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

bhamburger@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7658
Party name: The Cato Institute
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
9164485100
Party name: Civil Justice Association of California
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.472.2356
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: California New Car Dealers Association